Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1974-02-17 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 441, 17 fev. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1974-01-20 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 439, 20 jan. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1974-11-03 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 457 , 03 nov. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor | |
1972-09-10 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 16 nº 408, 10 set. 1972] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor | |
1893-10-01 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 9, nº 400, 01 out. 1893] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Sousa, Francisco Borges de, colaborador | |
1893-10-08 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 9, nº 401, 08 out. 1893] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1894-09-23 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 10, nº 446, 23 set. 1894] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1894-07-29 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 10, nº 439, 29 jul. 1894] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1895-03-17 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 10, nº 467, 17 mar. 1895] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1897-11-14 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 13, nº 575, 14 nov. 1897] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Campos, Alfredo, colaborador |