Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Results 1-8 of 8 (Search time: 0.009 seconds).
- previous
- 1
- next
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1966-09-11 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 263, 11 set. 1966] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Faria, Armindo, colaborador | |
1973-07-22 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 427, 22 jul. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1973-09-23 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 431, 23 set. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1966-08-28 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 262, 28 ago. 1966] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Faria, Armindo, colaborador | |
1976-08-22 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 18, nº 492, 22 ago. 1976] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1968-08-18 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 12, nº 310, 18 ago. 1968] | Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Faria, Armindo, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor | |
1976-10-22 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 18, nº 494, 19 set. 1976] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1974-08-18 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 452, 18 ago. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador |