Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1971-11-07 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 388, 07 nov. 1971] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1973-12-09 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 435, 09 dez. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1972-01-02 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 392, 02 jan. 1972] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor | |
1974-11-03 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 457 , 03 nov. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor | |
1974-11-17 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 458, 17 nov. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Marques, Acácio, colaborador; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor |