Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1976-07-04 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 18, nº 490, 04 jul. 1976] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1976-10-22 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 18, nº 494, 19 set. 1976] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1967-01-29 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 273, 29 jan. 1967] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Faria, Armindo de, colaborador | |
1967-05-21 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 11 nº 280, 21 mai. 1967] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Faria, Armindo de, colaborador | |
1972-06-18 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 16, nº 402, 18 jun. 1972] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor | |
1976-12-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 18, nº 498, 19 dez. 1976] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1974-07-14 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 450, 14 jul. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1974-07-28 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 451, 28 jul. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1974-06-23 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 449, 23 jun. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1974-05-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 447, 19 mai. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador |
Discover
Subject