Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1963-09-15 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 7, nº 189, 15 set. 1963] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Ferraz, Emiliana, colaboradora | |
1972-01-02 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 392, 02 jan. 1972] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor | |
1974-09-29 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 455, 29 set. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1973-07-08 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 426, 08 jul. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1973-01-28 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 16, nº 417, 28 jan. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1973-02-11 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 16, nº 418, 11 fev. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1972-07-16 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 16, nº 404, 16 jul. 1972] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor | |
1972-08-06 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 16, nº 405, 06 ago. 1972] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Almeida, Francisco de, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor | |
1972-06-18 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 16, nº 402, 18 jun. 1972] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor | |
1974-07-28 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 451, 28 jul. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador |