Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1902-01-05 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 17, nº 764, 05 jan. 1902] | Pereira, Bernardo António de Sá, administrador; Pereira, José Joaquim, editor; Teixeira, Castro, colaborador | |
1904-01-10 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 19, nº 865, 10 jan. 1904] | Pereira, Bernardo António de Sá, administrador; Pereira, José Joaquim, editor; Castro, Frederico A. Pereira, redator | |
1904-03-20 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 19, nº 874, 20 mar. 1904] | Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Pereira, José Joaquim, editor; Castro, Frederico A. Pereira, redator | |
1903-04-05 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 18, nº 827, 05 abr. 1903] | Pereira, Bernardo António de Sá, administrador; Pereira, José Joaquim, editor | |
1903-05-17 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 18, nº 832, 17 mai. 1903] | Pereira, Bernardo António de Sá, administrador; Pereira, José Joaquim, editor; Teixeira, José de Castro, colaborador | |
1903-05-31 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 18, nº 834, 31 mai. 1903] | Pereira, Bernardo António de Sá, administrador; Pereira, José Joaquim, editor | |
1964-11-22 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 219, 22 nov. 1964] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Costa, Manuel Magalhães, colaborador | |
1965-07-04 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 9, nº 234, 04 jul. 1963] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1957-05-26 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 2, nº 31, 26 mai. 1957] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário | |
1962-04-01 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 6, nº 153, 01 abr. 1962] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator |