Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Results 1-9 of 9 (Search time: 0.404 seconds).
- previous
- 1
- next
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1971-11-21 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 389, 21 nov. 1971] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1971-09-26 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 385, 26 set. 1971] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1971-10-10 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 386, 10 out. 1971] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1971-01-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 391, 19 dez. 1971] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1971-12-05 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 390, 05 dez. 1971] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1971-05-30 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 377, 30 mai. 1971] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1971-10-24 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 387, 24 out. 1971] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1971-02-17 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 368, 17 jan. 1971] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1971-09-12 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 384, 12 set. 1971] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador |