Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Results 1-7 of 7 (Search time: 0.222 seconds).
- previous
- 1
- next
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1965-04-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 227, 19 mar. 1965] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1965-03-07 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 226, 07 mar. 1965] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1965-05-02 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 9, nº 230, 02 mai. 1965] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1965-10-24 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 9, nº 241, 24 out. 1965] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1965-10-10 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 9, nº 240, 10 out. 1965] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1965-09-05 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 9, nº 238, 05 out. 1965] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Sá, António, colaborador | |
1965-09-26 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 9, nº 239, 26 set. 1965] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador |