Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1891-06-07 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 293, 07 jun. 1891] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1892-03-20 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 7, nº 332, 20 mar. 1892] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Oliveira, Francisco M.M. de, colaborador; Castro, João, colaborador | |
1892-04-03 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 7, nº 333, 03 abr. 1892] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Oliveira, Francisco M.M. de, colaborador | |
1892-02-28 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 7, nº 329, 28 fev. 1892] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Oliveira, Francisco M.M. de, colaborador | |
1892-03-06 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 7, nº 330, 06 mar. 1892] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Oliveira, Francisco M.M. de, colaborador; Maia, Abílio, colaborador; Castro, João de, colaborador | |
1890-08-10 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 253, 10 ago. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-08-31 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 255, 31 ago. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1892-01-24 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 7, nº 325, 24 jan. 1892] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Oliveira, Francisco M.M. de, colaborador | |
1892-01-31 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 7, nº 326, 31 jan. 1892] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Oliveira, Francisco M.M. de, colaborador | |
1892-02-14 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 7, nº 327, 14 fev. 1892] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Junior, António Adriano, colaborador |