Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1964-12-06 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 220, 6 dez. 1964] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1964-12-22 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 221, 20 dez. 1964] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1965-11-21 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 9, nº 243, 21 nov. 1965] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1967-01-29 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 273, 29 jan. 1967] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Faria, Armindo de, colaborador | |
1965-08-22 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 9, nº 237, 22 ago. 1965] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1964-11-22 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 219, 22 nov. 1964] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Costa, Manuel Magalhães, colaborador | |
1970-12-20 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 366, 20 dez. 1970] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor | |
1972-02-06 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 394, 06 fev. 1972] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor | |
1972-07-02 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 16, nº 403, 02 jul. 1972] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Gonçalves, Arlindo, colaborador; Pinto, Maria Luísa Carneiro, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1970-04-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 350, 19 abr 1970] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor |