Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1969-01-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 12, nº 320, 19 jan. 1969] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor | |
1964-08-23 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 213, 23 ago. 1964] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, Proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1964-12-06 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 220, 6 dez. 1964] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1969-04-20 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 13, nº 326, 20 abr. 1969] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1969-08-03 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 13, nº 333, 03 ago. 1969] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1966-07-31 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 260, 31 jul. 1966] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1964-06-28 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 209, 28 jun. 1964] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1965-10-10 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 9, nº 240, 10 out. 1965] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1964-11-08 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 217, 08 nov. 1964] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1967-05-21 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 11 nº 280, 21 mai. 1967] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Faria, Armindo de, colaborador |
Discover
Subject