Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1963-01-13 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 6, nº 172, 13 jan. 1963] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1963-01-27 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 6, nº 173, 27 jan. 1963] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1963-11-24 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 7, nº 194, 24 nov. 1963] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1963-10-13 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 7, nº 191, 13 out. 1963] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1963-10-27 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 7, nº 192, 27 out. 1963] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1963-03-10 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 6, nº 176, 10 mar. 1963] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1963-03-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 7, nº 177, 19 mar. 1963] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Ferraz, Emiliana, colaborador | |
1963-02-24 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 6, nº 175, 24 fev. 1963] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1963-09-15 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 7, nº 189, 15 set. 1963] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Ferraz, Emiliana, colaboradora | |
1963-06-30 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 7, nº 184, 30 jun. 1963] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador |