Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1890-08-24 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 254, 24 ago. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Navarro, Armando, colaborador | |
1889-01-20 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 5, nº 178, 20 jan. 1889] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Coimbra, Eduardo, colaborador | |
1889-03-10 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 5, nº 184, 10 mar. 1889] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1890-09-14 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6 nº 257, 14 set. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Feio, Francisco, colaborador | |
1890-08-31 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 255, 31 ago. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-09-07 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 256, 07 set. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-09-28 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 259, 28 set. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Amorim, Gomes de, colaborador; Penha, João, colaborador | |
1890-10-12 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 261, 12 out. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-10-26 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 263, 26 out. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-09-21 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 258, 21 set. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Guimarães, Luís, colaborador |
Discover
Subject
Has File(s)
- 12 true