Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1973-11-25 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 434, 25 nov. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1973-10-07 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 432, 07 out. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1973-07-08 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 426, 08 jul. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1974-10-13 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 456, 13 out. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1973-08-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 429, 19 ago. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1968-01-07 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 12, nº 295, 07 jan. 1968] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Faria, Armindo, colaborador | |
1973-09-02 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 430, 02 set. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador; Sá, António de, colaborador | |
1966-08-28 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 262, 28 ago. 1966] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Faria, Armindo, colaborador | |
1971-01-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 14, nº 391, 19 dez. 1971] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1968-03-31 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 12, nº 301, 31 mar. 1968] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator |
Discover
Subject
Date issued
- 71 1970 - 1976
- 25 1960 - 1969
- 10 1890 - 1899
- 1 1889 - 1889