Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1961-11-26 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 5, nº 144, 26 nov. 1961] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário | |
1967-04-30 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 11, nº 279, 30 abr. 1967] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Faria, Armindo de, colaborador | |
1967-07-02 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 11, nº 283, 02 jul. 1967] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Faria, Armindo de, colaborador | |
1966-06-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 257, 19 jun. 1966] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Faria, Armindo, colaborador | |
1968-02-04 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 12, nº 297, 04 fev. 1968] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1973-10-07 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 432, 07 out. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1968-01-07 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 12, nº 295, 07 jan. 1968] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Faria, Armindo, colaborador | |
1968-03-31 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 12, nº 301, 31 mar. 1968] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1973-04-01 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 421, 01 abr. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1966-07-17 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 259, 17 jul. 1966] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Faria, Armindo, colaborador |