Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1969-07-20 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 13, nº 332, 20 jul. 1969] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1967-03-05 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 275, 05 mar. 1967] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Faria, Armindo de, colaborador | |
1973-11-04 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 434, 04 nov. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1973-06-24 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 425, 24 jun. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1973-07-22 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 427, 22 jul. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1973-09-23 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 431, 23 set. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1973-10-07 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 432, 07 out. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1973-07-08 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 426, 08 jul. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1974-10-13 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 456, 13 out. 1974] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador | |
1973-08-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 17, nº 429, 19 ago. 1973] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Gonçalves, José Lopes, colaborador |
Discover
Subject