Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1889-07-14 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 5, nº 200, 14 jul. 1889] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Maia, Abílio, colaborador; Maupassan, Guy, colaborador | |
1889-06-02 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 5, nº 195, 02 jun. 1889] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Maia, Abilio, colaborador | |
1889-05-26 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 5, nº 194, 26 mai. 1889] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Falcão, Trigueiros, colaborador | |
1889-09-08 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 5, nº 208, 08 set. 1889] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Maia, Abílio, colaborador | |
1889-08-25 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 5, nº 206, 25 ago. 1889] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Mota, Vilela da, colaborador; Bouvier, Alexis, colaborador | |
1889-08-04 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 5, nº 203, 04 ago. 1889] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Maia, Abílio, colaborador; Campos, Alfredo, colaborador | |
1889-07-28 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 5, nº 202, 28 jul. 1889] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Maia, Abílio, colaborador; Mendes, Catulle, colaborador | |
1889-01-27 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 5, nº 179, 27 jan. 1889] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1889-01-13 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 5, nº 177, 13 jan. 1889] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1889-01-06 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 5, nº 176, 06 jan. 1889] | Sepulveda, J.A. de, colaborador; Guimarães, Velho, colaborador; Feio, Francisco, colaborador; Faria, Arnaldo de, colaborador; Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador |