Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1890-09-07 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 256, 07 set. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-09-28 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 259, 28 set. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Amorim, Gomes de, colaborador; Penha, João, colaborador | |
1890-10-12 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 261, 12 out. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-10-26 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 263, 26 out. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-09-21 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 258, 21 set. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Guimarães, Luís, colaborador | |
1890-10-05 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 260, 05 out. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-11-09 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 265, 09 nov. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Diabos, Enxola, colaborador | |
1890-11-02 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 264, 02 nov. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-06-08 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 244, 08 jun. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Araújo, António M. Borges, colaborador | |
1890-07-06 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 248, 06 jul. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Júnior, António Silveira, colaborador |