Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1890-11-23 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 267, 23 nov. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Diabos, Enxola, colaborador | |
1890-12-07 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 269, 07 dez. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Allen, V. de Vilar de, colaborador | |
1890-11-30 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 268, 30 nov. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Deus, João de, colaborador; Allen, V. de Vilar de, colaborador | |
1890-10-19 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 262, 19 out. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-11-16 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 266, 16 nov. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-09-14 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6 nº 257, 14 set. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Feio, Francisco, colaborador | |
1890-07-20 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 250, 20 jul. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-12-21 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 271, 21 dez. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-08-10 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 253, 10 ago. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-08-31 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 255, 31 ago. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável |
Discover
Subject
Has File(s)
- 49 true