Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1962-07-01 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 6, nº 159, 01 jul. 1962] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1966-03-06 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 9, nº 250, 6 mar. 1966] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Sá, António, colaborador | |
1966-02-20 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 9, nº 249, 20 fev. 1966] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1966-09-11 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 263, 11 set. 1966] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Faria, Armindo, colaborador | |
1966-06-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 257, 19 jun. 1966] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Faria, Armindo, colaborador | |
1966-05-01 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 254, 01 mai. 1966] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Faria, Armindo, colaborador | |
1969-07-20 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 13, nº 332, 20 jul. 1969] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1968-11-03 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 12, nº 315, 03 nov. 1968] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Faria, Armindo, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Fernandes, diretor | |
1968-05-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 12, nº 304, 19 mai. 1968] | Fernandes, Severino Pereira, direto; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Faria, Armindo, colocaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor | |
1968-10-20 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 12, nº 314, 20 out. 1968] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Carmo, Mário, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Fernandes, diretor |
Discover
Subject