Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1962-05-20 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 6, nº 156, 20 mai. 1962] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1965-06-20 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 9, nº 233, 20 jun. 1965] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1966-06-19 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 257, 19 jun. 1966] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Faria, Armindo, colaborador | |
1964-06-14 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 208, 14 Jun. 1964] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Araújo, Silva, colaborador; Sá, António, colaborador | |
1969-06-15 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 13, nº 330, 15 jun. 1969] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, editor; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, diretor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1966-05-15 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 10, nº 255, 15 mai. 1966] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1964-05-31 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 207, 31 mai. 1964] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, Proprietário; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador | |
1964-05-17 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 206, 17 mai. 1964] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, Proprietário; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, redator | |
1963-06-30 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 7, nº 184, 30 jun. 1963] | Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, proprietário; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Diogo, Manuel Gonçalves, colaborador; Fernandes, Severino Pereira, administrador | |
1964-05-03 | O Vilaverdense [Ano 8, nº 205, 03 mai. 1964] | Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, diretor; Silva, Domingos Peixoto da C. e, editor; Irmandade de Nossa Senhora do Alívio, Proprietário; Pereira, Severino Fernandes, redator; Sá, António colaborador; Araújo, Silva, colaborador |
Discover
Subject