Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1891-01-18 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 274, 18 jan. 1891] | Lima, Aurora do, colaborador; Noticioso, colaborador; Regenerador, colaborador; Cavado, Aurora de, colaborador; Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1891-02-15 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 278 15 fev. 1891] | Seco, F. de Moura, colaborador; Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1891-02-22 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 279, 22 fev. 1891] | Souto, Diogo, colaborador; Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1891-03-15 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 282, 15 mar. 1891] | Oliveira, Francisco M.M. de, colaborador; Junqueiro, Guerra, colaborador; Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1891-02-01 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 276, 01 fev. 1891] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1891-03-08 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 281, 08 mar. 1891] | Albano, Agostinho, colaborador; Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1891-02-08 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 277, 08 fev. 1891] | Napoles, J. de Lemos e, colaborador; Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador | |
1890-12-07 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 269, 07 dez. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Allen, V. de Vilar de, colaborador | |
1890-09-14 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6 nº 257, 14 set. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Feio, Francisco, colaborador | |
1891-01-11 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 273, 11 jan. 1891] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador |