Search
Add filters:
Use filters to refine the search results.
Item hits:
Preview | Issue Date | Title | Author(s) |
---|---|---|---|
1890-08-24 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 254, 24 ago. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Navarro, Armando, colaborador | |
1890-08-03 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 252, 03 ago. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-05-25 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 242, 25 mai. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Oliveira, Francisco M. M. de, colaborador | |
1890-06-01 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 243, 01 jun. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Caldas, Braulio, colaborador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-06-22 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 246, 22 jun. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-04-27 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 238, 27 abr. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Campos, Alfredo, colaborador | |
1890-06-15 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 245, 15 jun. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Feio, Francisco, colaborador; Semedo, Curdo, colaborador | |
1890-05-18 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 241, 18 mai. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-07-27 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 251, 27 jul. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável | |
1890-07-13 | A Folha de Vila Verde [Ano 6, nº 249, 13 jul. 1890] | Barbosa, António Maria, representante; Pereira, Bernardo A. de Sá, administrador; Antunes, Manuel Joaquim, responsável; Junqueiro, Guerra, colaborador |